Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/30/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/13/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 11/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/03/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/11/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/01/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014