Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2014