There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TRUE Safety Act
True Understanding of the Economy and Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a study and report by the Comptroller General regarding the restart provision of the Hours of Service Rules for Commercial Truck Drivers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/30/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/31/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/30/2013Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/18/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/28/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/30/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit10/31/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3413. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/30/2013)

True Understanding of the Economy and Safety Act or TRUE Safety Act - Directs the Comptroller General (GAO), after the Administrator of the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA) reports to Congress on an hours of service field study, to assess the methodology followed by the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) in carrying out the efficacy of the restart rule ("Hours of Service of Drivers") published on December 27, 2011, which applies to operators of commercial motor vehicles of property subject to maximum DOT driving time requirements.

Requires the assessment to evaluate the extent to which that methodology meets the requirements of the Moving Ahead for Progress in the 21st Century Act (MAP-21) that: (1) the data collected is representative of the drivers subject to the restart rule, (2) the methodology is statistically valid, and (3) the study followed the FMCSA plan for the "Scheduling and Fatigue Recovery Project."

Directs GAO to assess the Regulatory Impact Analysis that accompanied the final 2011 restart rule.

Nullifies the 2011 restart rule until six months after the study report required by this Act has been submitted to Congress.

Prohibits the Secretary from applying the restart rule if the conclusions of the field study completed pursuant to MAP-21 do not support or concur with the conclusions of the laboratory study on which the rule was based.