Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/28/2014