Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/04/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/01/2013