Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/30/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/29/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/18/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/02/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/09/2014