Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/14/2014