Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/28/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/28/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/06/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/15/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/25/2014