Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/30/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2014