Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/09/2014