Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/04/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/04/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/05/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/05/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/16/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/18/2014