Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/10/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/07/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/09/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/13/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/16/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/27/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/04/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/05/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/06/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/18/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/28/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/02/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/02/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/08/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/28/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/29/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/02/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/24/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/18/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2014