Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/21/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/03/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/2014