Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2014