Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2014