There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Second Chance Reauthorization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Second Chance Act of 2007.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/09/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/13/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/13/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/09/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/15/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/13/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/02/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/13/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/09/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3465. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/13/2013)

Second Chance Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to revise and expand requirements for the grant program for adult and juvenile offender state and local reentry demonstration projects and to extend the authorization for appropriations for such program through FY2018.

Amends the Second Chance Act of 2007 to extend through FY2018 the authorization of appropriations for grants for: (1) family-based substance abuse treatment, (2) the technology careers training demonstration program, and (3) the offender reentry substance abuse and criminal justice collaboration program. Renames the program of mentoring grants to nonprofit organizations for offender reentry as the program of community-based mentoring and transitional service grants to nonprofit organizations. Provides for enhanced services under such program to assist in the reintegration of offenders into the community. Extends the authorization of appropriations for such program through FY2018.

Requires the Inspector General of the Department of Justice (DOJ) to periodically conduct audits of not less than 5% of all recipients of specified offender reentry grants under the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 and the Second Chance Act of 2007.

Amends the Second Chance Act of 2007 to: (1) modify and extend through FY2018 grant programs for reentry of federal prisoners into the community, including the program for placing elderly offenders in home detention; (2) repeal programs under such Act relating to responsible reintegration of offenders, the study of the effectiveness of Depot Naltrexone for heroin addiction, and the satellite tracking and reentry training program; and (3) establish a program for partnering faith-based or community-based nonprofit organizations with prisons to conduct recidivism reduction activities.

Directs the Attorney General, in consultation with specified federal officials and in collaboration with interested persons and entities, to establish an interagency task force on federal programs and activities for the reentry of offenders into the community. Requires such task force to: (1) evaluate and identity methods for improving such programs and activities, and (2) report to Congress on barriers faced by offenders in reentering the community and update such report annually.