Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/15/2014