Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/13/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014