Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/15/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/02/2014