Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 11/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/15/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 11/19/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/19/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2014