Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/21/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/26/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/28/2014