Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 11/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/07/2014