Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/23/2013