Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/27/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/01/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/20/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2014