Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/20/2014