Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2014