Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/20/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2014