Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/06/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/24/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/15/2014