Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/04/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/16/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/10/2014