Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/04/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/09/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/10/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/10/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/15/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/16/2014