Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/07/2014