Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/17/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/17/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 12/11/2014