Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 12/16/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/17/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/20/2014