Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/09/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/16/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/10/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/25/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/15/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/18/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/20/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew