Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-72.
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
12/23/2013 Presented to President.
12/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9111)
11/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7163-7164)
11/14/2013 Introduced in House