Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014