Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/12/2013