Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/20/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/02/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/30/2014