Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/04/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/04/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/14/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/26/2014