Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/20/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/02/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/04/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/07/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/16/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/30/2014