Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/16/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/25/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/04/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/29/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/18/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/20/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/25/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/12/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/14/2014