There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 23, United States Code, with respect to the establishment of performance measures for the highway safety improvement program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/14/2013Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1667)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/03/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/03/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 01/03/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/13/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/29/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/29/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/03/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/11/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/01/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/28/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/02/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/07/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/07/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/14/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit11/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3494. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/14/2013)

Revises the highway safety improvement program.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT), under the highway safety improvement program, to establish performance measures for states to use to assess significant reductions in the number of serious injuries and fatalities (as under current law) specifically for both motorized and nonmotorized transportation.