Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/25/2013