There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

TEACH Act
Technology, Equality and Accessibility in College and Higher Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Architectural and Transportation Barriers Compliance Board to develop accessibility guidelines for electronic instructional materials and related information technologies in institutions of higher education, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/22/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
11/15/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1672-1673)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/10/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/30/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/23/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce11/15/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training01/22/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3505. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/15/2013)

Technology, Equality and Accessibility in College and Higher Education Act or the TEACH Act - Directs the Access Board to develop accessibility guidelines for electronic instructional materials and related information technologies in institutions of higher education (IHEs).

Requires those guidelines to: (1) include performance criteria to ensure that electronic instructional materials and related information technologies are accessible to the blind and disabled; (2) be consistent with the standards for technical and functional performance criteria issued pursuant to the Rehabilitation Act of 1973; and (3) be, to the extent practicable, consistent with national and international accessibility standards for those materials and technologies.

Directs the Access Board to review and, as appropriate, amend the guidelines every three years to reflect technological advances or changes in electronic instructional materials and related information technologies.

Deems IHEs that use electronic instructional materials and related information technologies that comply with the guidelines to be in compliance with nondiscrimination provisions under the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 and the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990.