Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/30/2014