Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/12/2014