Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/10/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/23/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2014