Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/06/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/06/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/30/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/19/2013