Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/14/2014