Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/29/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/29/2014